|
12.05.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.04.2022 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
10.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.10.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
20.10.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2020 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
17.07.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
73 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |