EP2628612 - Pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Susumu c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken, 651-0072 / JP | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12198674.9 | 20.12.2012 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | JP20120033103 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012033103 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628612 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2628612 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60C3/00, B60C3/04, B60C11/01 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B60C3/04 (EP,US);
B60C11/01 (EP,US);
B60C13/02 (US);
B60C2011/013 (EP,US);
B60C2013/006 (EP,US);
B60C2013/007 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [2013/34] | English: | Pneumatic tire | [2013/34] | French: | Pneu | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 29.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 17.12.2014 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | RS | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | IE | 20.12.2014 | LU | 20.12.2014 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
LU | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
LU | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
TR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
LU | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 20.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
RS | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0461858 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0010] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 2; table 1 *; | [A]EP0119152 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |