EP2615857 - Method for determining a future location of a mobile electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fonseca dos Santos, André Reinsburgstraße, 105A 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Aziz, Danish Stimpfacher Straße, 19 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12290011.1 | 10.01.2012 | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615857 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
H04W64/006 (EP);
H04W36/00837 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
G01S5/0294 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W36/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines zukünftigen Standorts einer mobilen elektronischen Vorrichtung | [2013/29] | English: | Method for determining a future location of a mobile electronic device | [2013/29] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer l'emplacement futur d'un dispositif électronique mobile | [2013/29] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006099952 (PREHOFER CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0 26] - [0037] - [ 117] - [0145] *; | [X]WO2009156554 (ELEKTROBIT WIRELESS COMM OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 7 *; | [X]US2011310867 (KENNEDY RICHARD HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] - [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 41] - [0048] - [0 72] , [0 73]; figure 1 *; | [A] - CELEBI H ET AL, "Utilization of Location Information in Cognitive Wireless Networks", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070801), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MWC.2007.4300977, ISSN 1536-1284, pages 6 - 13, XP011191772 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2007.4300977 |