Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2529720

EP2529720 - Inertial energy accumulating device for pelvic floor stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PELVIC SYSTEM CARE S.L.
C/ San Vicente, 8, 8° Dep.6 (Edificio Albia I)
48001 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES
[2015/28]
Former [2015/17]For all designated states
PELVIC SYSTEM CARE S.L.
C/ SAN VICENTE, 8, 8° DEP .6 (EDIFICOIO ALBIA I)
48001 Bilboa (Bizkaia) / ES
Former [2012/49]For all designated states
PELVIC SYSTEM CARE S.L.
Avenida Altos Hornos de Vizcaya 33
48902 Barakaldo / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Maria Olga, Polo Eguia
Urbanizacion Isasi 54 drcha.
01400 Llodio ( Alava ) / ES
 [2012/49]
Representative(s)Del Valle Valiente, Sonia
C/ Miguel Angel Cantero Oliva, 5,53
28660 Boadilla del Monte-Madrid / ES
[2015/28]
Former [2012/49]Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
31, Principe de Vergara St.
28001 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date12380027.824.05.2012
[2012/49]
Priority number, dateES2011000059530.05.2011         Original published format: ES 201100595
[2012/49]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2529720
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2529720
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61H21/00
[2012/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2012/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Anhäufung von Trägheitsenergie zur Beckenbodenstimulation[2012/49]
English:Inertial energy accumulating device for pelvic floor stimulation[2012/49]
French:Dispositif d'accumulation d'énergie inertielle pour stimulation du plancher pelvien[2012/49]
Examination procedure28.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/28]
31.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2015Fee for grant paid
12.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2014
Opposition(s)11.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.05.2012
AT08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
GR08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU24.05.2012
AT08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
GR08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MK08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
SM08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/36]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/23]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RS08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT08.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202009010633U  (WEFO TEC DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12 * the whole document * [I] 3-8,11;
 [A]DE20113738U  (FUNFACTORY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantES2226590