EP2691735 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING A VEHICLE MEASUREMENT REFERENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beissbarth GmbH Hanauer Str. 101 80993 München / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKES, Jochen Landsberger Strasse 209 B 80687 Muenchen / DE | 02 /
HODISSEN, Sven Walter-Flex-Strasse 4 80637 Muenchen / DE | 03 /
UFFENKAMP, Volker Nelkenweg 2 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
WAGMANN, Christian Praterinsel 1 80538 Muenchen / DE | 05 /
PUCNIK, Darko Blumenstrasse 37 85774 Unterfoehring / DE | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 12701845.5 | 12.01.2012 | [2020/17] | WO2012EP50445 | Priority number, date | DE20111006328 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011006328 | DE201210200415 | 12.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012200415 | [2014/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012130484 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691735 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691735 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/275, G01B21/04 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
G01B11/275 (EP,US);
G01B21/02 (US);
G01B21/042 (EP,US);
G01B2210/12 (EP,US);
G01B2210/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KALIBRIEREN EINES REFERENZSYSTEMS ZUR FAHRZEUGVERMESSUNG | [2014/06] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING A VEHICLE MEASUREMENT REFERENCE SYSTEM | [2014/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE CALIBRAGE D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFÉRENCE POUR LA MESURE DE VÉHICULES | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 07.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2012 | AL | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | AT | 12.01.2021 | GB | 12.01.2021 | IE | 12.01.2021 | LU | 12.01.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.01.2021 | ||
GB | 12.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.01.2021 | ||
GB | 12.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 12.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 12.01.2021 | ||
IE | 12.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 12.01.2021 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5748505 (GREER DALE R [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03044458 (MAPVISION OY LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2005108020 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 9; | [X]WO2005124276 (BURKHARD HEINS [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 15 - page 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006152711 (DALE JAMES L JR [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2010028946 | DE102010039246 |