EP2678012 - C-GLUCOSIDIC ELLAGITANNIN COMPOUNDS FOR USE FOR ALTERING THE SUPRAMOLECULAR ARRANGEMENT OF ACTIN AND FOR THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOPOROSIS, CANCER, BACTERIAL INFECTION AND VIRAL INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUIDEAU, Stéphane Université Bordeaux 1 - Institut des Sciences Moléculaires (CNRS-UMR 5255) 2 rue Robert Escarpit F-33607 Pessac Cedex / FR | 02 /
GENOT, Elisabeth INSERM U1053 et Institut Européen de Chimie et Biologie 2 rue Robert Escarpit F-33607 Pessac Cedex / FR | 03 /
SALTEL, Frédéric INSERM U1053 et Institut Européen de Chimie et Biologie 2 rue Robert Escarpit F-33607 Pessac Cedex / FR | 04 /
DOUAT-CASASSUS, Céline Université Bordeaux 1 - Institut des Sciences Moléculaires (CNRS-UMR 5255) 2 rue Robert Escarpit F-33607 Pessac Cedex / FR | 05 /
DELANNOY LOPEZ, Daniela Mélanie Université Bordeaux 1 - Institut des Sciences Moléculaires (CNRS-UMR 5255) 2 rue Robert Escarpit F-33607 Pessac Cedex / FR | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12704839.5 | 22.02.2012 | WO2012EP53017 | Priority number, date | EP20110305186 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11305186 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113835 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678012 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/357, A61P35/00, A61P19/10 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/357 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | C-GLUCOSIDELLAGITANNIN-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER SUPRAMOLEKULAREN ANORDNUNG VON AKTIN UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOPOROSE, KREBS, BAKTERIENINFEKTIONEN UND VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2014/01] | English: | C-GLUCOSIDIC ELLAGITANNIN COMPOUNDS FOR USE FOR ALTERING THE SUPRAMOLECULAR ARRANGEMENT OF ACTIN AND FOR THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOPOROSIS, CANCER, BACTERIAL INFECTION AND VIRAL INFECTION | [2014/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS D'ELLAGITANIN C-GLUCOSIDIQUE DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS POUR MODIFIER L'ARRANGEMENT SUPRAMOLÉCULAIRE DE L'ACTINE ET POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OSTÉOPOROSE, DU CANCER, D'UNE INFECTION BACTÉRIENNE ET UNE D'INFECTION VIRALE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007127263 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 15] , [0 31] - [0036] - [0 67] - [0079] *; | [X]WO2009114810 (FLORIDA INTERNAT UINVERSITY BO [US], et al) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0015] , [0 19] - [0026]; claim - *; | [X]US2011039796 (LIU ZHIJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0 18] *; | [X] - HO H H ET AL, "Anti-metastasis effects of gallic acid on gastric cancer cells involves inhibition of NF-kappaB activity and downregulation of PI3K/AKT/small GTPase signals", FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 48, no. 8-9, ISSN 0278-6915, (20100801), pages 2508 - 2516, (20100618), XP027166468 [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2512, paragraph l - page 2515, column left, paragraph l * | [X] - NIRALA S K ET AL, "530 INTERCELLULAR COMMUNICATION THROUGH TUNNELING NANOTUBES: A POSSIBLE TARGET FOR ANTI-CANCER THERAPIES", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, MUNKSGAARD INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHERS, COPENHAGEN, DK, vol. 50, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0168-8278(09)60532-8, ISSN 0168-8278, (20090401), page S197, (20090401), XP026496143 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(09)60532-8 | [X] - KASHIWADA Y ET AL, "ANTITUMOR AGENTS, 129. TANNINS AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS SELECTIVE CYTOTOXIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19920801), vol. 55, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1021/NP50086A002, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 1033 - 1043, XP009064352 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50086a002 | [X] - OKUDA ET AL, "Systematics and health effects of chemically distinct tannins in medicinal plants", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (20050901), vol. 66, no. 17, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.PHYTOCHEM.2005.04.023, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 2012 - 2031, XP005076919 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * "14.1. Inhibition of skin-tumor promotion by EGCG, pentagalloylglucose, ellagic acid and C-glucosidic ellagitannins""; page 2024 * * Paragraph linking pages 2025-2026 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phytochem.2005.04.023 | [X] - YOSHIMURA M ET AL, "Flavonol glucuronides and C-glucosidic ellagitannins from Melaleuca squarrosa", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 69, no. 18, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.PHYTOCHEM.2008.04.004, ISSN 0031-9422, (20081201), pages 3062 - 3069, (20080522), XP025744310 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phytochem.2008.04.004 | [X] - ITO HIDEYUKI ET AL, "Anti-tumor promoting activity of polyphenols from Cowania mexicana and Coleogyne ramosissima", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 143, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0304-3835(99)00160-3, ISSN 0304-3835, (19990823), pages 5 - 13, (19990723), XP009147210 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(99)00160-3 | [X] - MARZOUK MOHAMED S A ET AL, "Anticancer and antioxidant Tannins from Pimenta dioica leaves", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFORSCHUNG. C, A JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCES, TUEBINGEN, DE, (20070701), vol. 62, no. 7-8, ISSN 0939-5075, pages 526 - 536, XP009147300 [X] 1-13 * abstract * | [XD] - HOFFMANN O ET AL, "Potent inhibitory effect of naturally occurring ellagitannins on in vitro osteoclastic bone resorption", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, (20061101), vol. 39, no. 5, ISSN 8756-3282, pages S9 - S10, XP009147298 [XD] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - TAGURI TOSHITSUGU ET AL, "Antimicrobial activity of 10 different plant polyphenols against bacteria causing food-borne disease.", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN DEC 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15577214, (200412), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 1965 - 1969, XP002633776 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * table 3 * * Paragraph linking left and right columns on page 1969 * | [X] - ITO H, "Oxidized ellagitannins in medicinal plants and their biological activities", NATURAL MEDICINES - SHOYAKUGAKU ZASSHI, JAPANESE SOCIETY OF PHARMACOGNOSY, TOKYO, JP, (20050401), vol. 59, no. 2, ISSN 1340-3443, pages 57 - 62, XP009147315 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | - CHEM PHARM BULL., (1995), vol. 43, no. 11, pages 2033 - 5 | - BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2004), vol. 325, no. 4, pages 1472 - 80 | - BONE, (2006), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 3 - 40 | - QUIDEAU ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (2005), vol. 11, pages 6503 - 6513 |