|
18.10.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2022 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2022 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2022 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.03.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.01.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.01.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 018 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 019 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 020 |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
22.10.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Appeal |
13 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Means of redress |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
41 |
|
26.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
74 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
20.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.11.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |