EP2672980 - SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR RESTORATION AND RECONSTITUTION OF GUT MICROBIOTA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lavivo AB Box 5021 426 05 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADSTRÖM, Torkel Trädgårdsgatan 11 S-452 24 Helsingborg / SE | 02 /
LJUNGH, Åsa Trädgårdsgatan 11 S-252 24 Helsingborg / SE | 03 /
AMBALAM, Padma Block no 11 Madhav Residency Near Kidwai Nagar 150 Ring Road Opposite to Modi High School Rajkot 360007 / IN | 04 /
KONDEPUDI, Kanthi Kiran H. No 2-39 Sujatha Nagar Chinnamushidiwada Pendurthi Mandalam, Visakhapatnam-531173 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2017/49] |
Former [2013/51] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 12706948.2 | 09.02.2012 | [2017/49] | WO2012SE50131 | Priority number, date | SE20110000084 | 09.02.2011 Original published format: SE 1100084 | SE20110000455 | 13.06.2011 Original published format: SE 1100455 | SE20110000487 | 21.06.2011 Original published format: SE 1100487 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012108830 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672980 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2672980 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P1/00, A61P1/12 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,BR,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/125 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,BR,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,BR,US);
A61K36/81 (EP,BR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,BR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3202, A23V2200/3204, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/612 (US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3202, A23V2200/3204, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/612, A23V2400/165, A23V2400/519 (EP) |
Former IPC [2013/51] | A61K35/74, A23L1/30, A61P1/00, A61P1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNBIOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SANIERUNG UND REKONSTITUTION DER DARMFLORA | [2013/51] | English: | SYNBIOTIC COMPOSITIONS FOR RESTORATION AND RECONSTITUTION OF GUT MICROBIOTA | [2013/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYMBIOTIQUES POUR LA RESTAURATION ET LA RECONSTITUTION DU MICROBIOTE INTESTINAL | [2013/51] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2012 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | IE | 09.02.2018 | LU | 09.02.2018 | MT | 09.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.02.2012 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
MT | 09.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.02.2012 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
MT | 09.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
MT | 09.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
MT | 09.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9734591 (UNIV NEW SOUTH WALES [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,13-16,23-33 * abstract * * page 12, line 1 - line 27; figures 7,8; example 1 * * page 15, line 9 - page 16, line 3 * [A] 4,7-12 [Y] 3,19-22; | [XA]GB2338244 (SHANGHAI SINE PHARMACEUTICAL C [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,6,13-18,23-33 * abstract * [A] 4,7-12; | [Y]WO2007140621 (NUTRAVITAL INC [CA], et al) [Y] 3,19-22 * claims 3-5,11 * * paragraph [0028]; table 2 *; | [A] - TIMMERMAN H M ET AL, "Monostrain, multistrain and multispecies probiotics-A comparison of functionality and efficacy", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041115), vol. 96, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.IJFOODMICRO.2004.05.012, ISSN 0168-1605, pages 219 - 233, XP004580747 [A] 1-33 * abstract * * page 222, column 1, paragraph l - page 224, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijfoodmicro.2004.05.012 | [A] - WENUS C ET AL, "Prevention of antibiotic-associated diarrhoea by a fermented probiotic milk drink", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (200802), vol. 62, no. 2, ISSN 0954-3007, pages 299 - 301, XP009158340 [A] 1-33 * abstract * * page 300, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ejcn.1602718 | [A] - CHAPMAN C M C ET AL, "Health benefits of probiotics: are mixtures more effective than single strains?", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (20110113), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 1436-6207, pages 1 - 17, XP002673829 [A] 1-33 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00394-010-0166-Z | [A] - WILLIAMS E A ET AL, "Clinical trial: a multistrain probiotic preparation significantly reduces symptoms of irritable bowel syndrome in a double-blind placebo-controlled study.", ALIMENTARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS JAN 2009 LNKD- DOI:10.1111/J.1365-2036.2008.03848.X PUBMED:18785988, (200901), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 1365-2036, pages 97 - 103, XP002673830 [A] 1-33 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2036.2008.03848.X | by applicant | - SANSONETTI, MUCOSAL IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 4, pages 8 - 14 |