|
16.07.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.02.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.11.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.06.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.11.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.11.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
11.07.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.02.2014 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.12.2013 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2013 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Published international application - A9 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2013 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |