EP2694290 - LAMINATE COMPRISING A POLYOLEFIN LAYER ADHERED TO A BASE LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Europe AG Avenue des Uttins, 3 1180 Rolle (Vaud) / CH | [2016/29] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Ineos Europe AG Avenue des Uttins 3 1180 Rolle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIBOTTE, Annick 21 rue de la Briqueterie B-1400 Nivelles / BE | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12711659.8 | 03.04.2012 | [2016/29] | WO2012EP56046 | Priority number, date | EP20110161738 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11161738 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136644 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694290 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694290 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, C08J5/18 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31917 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMINAT MIT EINER AN EINER BASISSCHICHT ANHAFTENDEN POLYOLEFINSCHICHT | [2014/07] | English: | LAMINATE COMPRISING A POLYOLEFIN LAYER ADHERED TO A BASE LAYER | [2014/07] | French: | STRATIFIÉ COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE POLYOLÉFINE COLLÉE À UNE COUCHE DE BASE | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 23.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2012 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 03.04.2017 | LU | 03.04.2017 | MT | 03.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.04.2012 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.04.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YD]GB2125802 (CHISSO CORP) [YD] 1-9,11-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 33; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]JPH02297435 (CHISSO CORP, et al) [Y] 1-9,11-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US2008131672 (SANG SIAW TECK [MY], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0091]; claims 1-12 * | by applicant | JPH02297435 | GB2125802 | EP0129368 | EP0206794 | EP0416815 | EP0420436 | WO9604290 | WO9500526 | EP0561479 | EP0418044 | EP0551277 | WO9827124 | WO9912981 | EP1015501 | EP1276777 | WO9850392 | WO9940125 | WO0005237 | WO0005238 | - CHEM REV, (2003), vol. 103, pages 283 - 315 | - CHEM REV, (2000), vol. 100, pages 1169 - 1203 | - ANGEW CHEM INT ED, (1999), vol. 38, pages 428 - 447 | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (1995), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 471 - 480 |