EP2812119 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING NONMAGNETIC COMPONENTS FROM A MIXTURE OF SCRAP METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/51] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING ALL NONMAGNETIC COMPONENTS FROM A MIXTURE OF SCRAP METAL IN ORDER TO OBTAIN PURE SCRAP IRON | ||
[2017/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOSLOW, Alexander Am Schloßanger 12 84036 Landshut / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states KOSLOW, Alexander Am Schloßanger 12 84036 Landshut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 12718325.9 | 15.03.2012 | [2018/09] | WO2012IB00502 | Priority number, date | DE20121002528 | 09.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002528 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117952 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812119 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812119 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/033, B03C1/22 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B03C1/22 (EP,US);
B03C1/0332 (EP,US);
B03C1/0335 (EP,US);
B03C1/30 (US);
B60R16/00 (EP);
C22B1/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG NICHTMAGNETISCHER BESTANDTEILE AUS EINEM GEMENGE VON METALLSCHROTT | [2017/34] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING NONMAGNETIC COMPONENTS FROM A MIXTURE OF SCRAP METAL | [2017/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DES CONSTITUANTS NON MAGNÉTIQUES D'UN MÉLANGE DE DÉCHETS MÉTALLIQUES | [2017/34] |
Former [2014/51] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABSONDERUNG ALLER NICHTMAGNETISCHEN BESTANDTEILE AUS EINEM GEMENGE VON METALLSCHROTT ZUR GEWINNUNG VON REINEM EISENSCHROTT | ||
Former [2014/51] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING ALL NONMAGNETIC COMPONENTS FROM A MIXTURE OF SCRAP METAL IN ORDER TO OBTAIN PURE SCRAP IRON | ||
Former [2014/51] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE TOUS LES CONSTITUANTS NON MAGNÉTIQUES D'UN MÉLANGE DE DÉCHETS MÉTALLIQUES EN VUE D'OBTENIR DES DÉCHETS PUREMENT FERREUX | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 19.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | MT | 28.02.2018 | |
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | MT | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE311387 (OBERSCHLESISCHE EISEN- UND KOHLENWERKE [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [XI]GB1000245 (TADASHI OHYAMA, et al) [X] 2,4,7 * figures 1, 5 * * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 52 * [I] 6; | [XY]US3935947 (BARRETT WILLIAM T) [X] 2,3,5 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * column 2, line 21 - column 7, line 65 * [Y] 1; | [A]US4214984 (MACELVAIN ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-7* figure 3 *; | [YA]DE202011100997U (KOSLOW ALEXANDER [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure nicht nummeriert * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 11] * [A] 3-6 | by applicant | DE311387 |