EP2694850 - ELECTRIC VALVE DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A DEVICE FOR FORMING ICE IN A FRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELBI International S.p.A. Corso Galileo Ferraris, 110 10129 Torino / IT | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA PONT, Paolo Via dei Mille 26 BIS I-10123 Torino / IT | 02 /
RENDESI, Maurizio Via dell'Olmo 3 I-10090 Villarbasse (Torino) / IT | 03 /
CAPIZZI, Giosuè Via della Pace 24 I-10090 Buttigliera Alta (Torino) / IT | 04 /
RAVEDATI, Paolo Via San Sebastiano 2 I-10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 12720592.0 | 02.04.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012IB51604 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00291 | 01.04.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110291 | [2014/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012131657 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2694850 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694850 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F16K27/02 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
F16K31/0658 (EP,US);
F16K27/029 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE VENTILVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR EISBILDUNG IN EINEM KÜHLSCHRANK | [2014/07] | English: | ELECTRIC VALVE DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A DEVICE FOR FORMING ICE IN A FRIDGE | [2014/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROVANNE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN DISPOSITIF SERVANT À PRODUIRE DE LA GLACE DANS UN RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2012 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | IE | 02.04.2016 | LU | 02.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 23.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GB | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 02.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 23.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4830333 (WATSON RICHARD D [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11 * the whole document * [I] 3,12; | [XI]US5586747 (BENNARDO GILBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * the whole document * [I] 3,12; | [XI]US5358215 (BUTH MARTIN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [XI]JPS6088285 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1,2,4-9,11 * abstract * [I] 3,12; | [XI]US5234032 (KLINE LOREN H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,16 * the whole document * [I] 10,12; | [X]JP2001267124 (TAIHEIYO KOGYO KK) [X] 1,4,10 * abstract * | by applicant | IT2010TO00506 |