EP2705397 - OPTICAL DEVICE FOR FORMING A LIGHT BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kwan, Nai c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN LIEROP, Maarten c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BIJLSMA, Albert c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
MOS, Barry c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
NUIJENS, Petrus, Gerardus, Josephus, Maria c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/11] | 01 /
LEE, Kwan, Nai c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
VAN LIEROP, Maarten c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
BIJLSMA, Albert c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
MOS, Barry c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
05 /
NUIJENS, Petrus, Gerardus, Josephus, Maria c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/11] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12722879.9 | 27.04.2012 | [2019/26] | WO2012IB52106 | Priority number, date | EP20110164927 | 05.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11164927 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012150533 | Date: | 08.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705397 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705397 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/08, G02B27/09, F21V5/04 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21K9/60 (EP,US);
F21V5/007 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21S8/086 (EP,US);
F21V13/00 (RU);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FORMUNG EINES LICHTSTRAHLS | [2014/11] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE FOR FORMING A LIGHT BEAM | [2014/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE POUR FORMER UN FAISCEAU LUMINEUX | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2012 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 27.04.2020 | IT | 27.04.2020 | LU | 27.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MK | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
IT | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006018010 (BLUMEL SIMON [DE]) [X] 1-10,15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2008151550 (LIU YING [CN], et al) [A] 4,5* figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2011007513 (ZHANG HAI-WEI [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-10,15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2011096533 (SEKELA WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,15 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] * | by applicant | EP2135005 |