EP2705139 - USE OF AT LEAST ONE CHELATING AGENT INTRODUCED INTO THE CULTURE MEDIUM OF MAGNETOTACTIC BACTERIA IN ORDER TO STIMULATE THE GROWTH THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21, rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6) 4, Place Jussieu 75005 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALPHANDERY, Edouard 36 boulevard Flandrin F-70516 Paris / FR | 02 /
CHEBBI, Imène 51 boulevard Foch F-93800 Epinay Sur Seine / FR | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/11] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12722893.0 | 04.05.2012 | [2018/35] | WO2012IB52235 | Priority number, date | FR20110053938 | 06.05.2011 Original published format: FR 1153938 | [2014/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153247 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2705139 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705139 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N1/38, C12P3/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/38 (EP,US);
C12P3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MINDESTENS EINEM IN DAS KULTURMEDIUM VON MAGNETOTAKTISCHEN BAKTERIEN EINGEBRACHTEN CHELATBILDNER ZUR STIMULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS | [2018/10] | English: | USE OF AT LEAST ONE CHELATING AGENT INTRODUCED INTO THE CULTURE MEDIUM OF MAGNETOTACTIC BACTERIA IN ORDER TO STIMULATE THE GROWTH THEREOF | [2014/11] | French: | UTILISATION D'AU MOINS UN AGENT CHELATANT INTRODUIT DANS LE MILIEU DE CULTURE DE BACTERIES MAGNETOTACTIQUES POUR STIMULER LA CROISSANCE DE CES BACTERIES | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/11] | VERWENDUNG VON MINDESTENS EINEM IN DAS KULTURMEDIUM VON MAGNETOTAKTISCHEN BAKTERIEN INDUZIERTEN CHELATXBILDNER ZUR STIMULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2012 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | IE | 04.05.2019 | LU | 04.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.05.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2011061259 (NANOBACTERIE [FR], et al) [XP] 1-8 * page 15, line 25 - page 17, line 24 * * page 14, line 21 - line 24 *; | [XI] - MATSUNAGA T ET AL, "Mass culture of magnetic bacteria and their application to flow type immunoassays", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS 1990 SEP, (19900417), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1109/20.104444, pages 1557 - 1559, XP002665003 [X] 1-8 * page 1558, column r, paragraph l - page 1559, column l, paragraph 1 * [I] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1109/20.104444 | [XI] - YANG CHEN-DONG ET AL, "Effects of growth medium composition, iron sources and atmospheric oxygen concentrations on production of luciferase-bacterial magnetic particle complex by a recombinant Magnetospirillum magneticum AMB-1", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (20010705), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 13 - 19, XP002665004 [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * page 16; figure 3; table 3 * [I] 4,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(01)00343-X | [XP] - ALPHANDÉRY EDOUARD ET AL, "Chains of magnetosomes extracted from AMB-1 magnetotactic bacteria for application in alternative magnetic field cancer therapy.", ACS NANO 23 AUG 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21732678, (20110823), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 1936-086X, pages 6279 - 6296, XP002665005 [XP] 1-8 * page 6293, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn201290k | Examination | - MATSUNAGA T ET AL, "MAGNETITE FORMATION BY A MAGNETIC BACTERIUM CAPABLE OF GROWING AEROBICALLY", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1007/BF00169632, ISSN 0175-7598, (19910101), pages 651 - 655, (20041116), XP008146083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00169632 | - MATSUNAGA T ET AL, "Production of luciferase-magnetic particle complex by recombinant Magnetospirillum sp. AMB-1", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20001220), vol. 70, no. 6, doi:10.1002/1097-0290(20001220)70:6<704::AID-BIT14>3.0.CO;2-E, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 704 - 709, XP002367587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0290(20001220)70:6<704::AID-BIT14>3.0.CO;2-E | by applicant | US6251365 | WO2004064921 | US2003028071 | US2006167313 | US2008268061 | CN101376900 | CN101434922 | CN101434921 | - BAZYLINSKI ET AL., NAT. REV. MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 2, pages 217 - 230 | - ARAKAKI ET AL., J R. SOC. INTERFACE, (2005), vol. 5, pages 977 - 999 | - SUN ET AL., CANCER. LETT., (2007), vol. 258, pages 109 - 117 | - SUN ET AL., J. NANOSCI. NANOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 9, pages 1881 - 1885 | - SUN ET AL., NANOTOXICOLOGY, (2010), vol. 4, pages 271 - 283 | - ALPHANDÉRY ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2011), vol. 115, pages 18 - 22 | - U. HEYEN ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 61, pages 536 - 544 | - C. LANG ET AL., J. PHYS. CONDENS. MATTER., (2006), vol. 18, pages S2815 - S2828 | - U. HEYEN, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 61, pages 536 - 544 | - L. WILDER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 3721 - 3728 | - M. NEVES, N. MED. BIOL., (2002), vol. 29, pages 329 - 338 | - H. SHINODA ET AL., CALCIF. TISSUE INT., (1983), vol. 35, pages 87 - 89 | - M. A. MERREL, EUR. J. PHRAMACOL., (2007), vol. 570, pages 27 - 37 | - KUNDUKUNDU, SRIKANYA KULKARNI, GAURI R ET AL., "Enhancement of magnetotactic bacterial yield in a modified MSGM medium without alteration of magnetosomes properties", INDIAN J EXP BIOL, (201005), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 518 - 523 | WO2010EP67765 |