EP2601585 - DATA RETURNED RESPONSIVE TO EXECUTING A START SUBCHANNEL INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Place Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZWED, Peter, Kenneth IBM Corporation Mail Drop P318 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | 02 /
OAKES, Kenneth, James c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire, SO21 2JN / GB | 03 /
SUTTON, Peter, Grimm IBM Corporation Mail Drop P328 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | 04 /
DRIEVER, Peter, Dana IBM Corporation Mail Drop P343 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | 05 /
YUDENFRIEND, Harry IBM Corporation Mail Drop P328 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | 06 /
GLASSEN, Steven, Gardner IBM Corporation Intellectual Property Law 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | [2014/14] |
Former [2013/24] | 01 /
SZWED, Peter, Kenneth IBM Corporation Mail Drop P318 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | ||
02 /
OAKES, Kenneth, James IBM Corporation Mail Drop P343 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | |||
03 /
SUTTON, Peter, Grimm IBM Corporation Mail Drop P328 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | |||
04 /
DRIEVER, Peter, Dana IBM Corporation Mail Drop P343 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | |||
05 /
YUDENFRIEND, Harry IBM Corporation Mail Drop P328 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | |||
06 /
GLASSEN, Steven, Gardner IBM Corporation Intellectual Property Law 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12601-5400 / US | Representative(s) | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 12723507.5 | 25.05.2012 | WO2012EP59861 | Priority number, date | US201113157735 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US201113157735 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012168100 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601585 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2601585 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12, G06F13/28 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G06F13/124 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3861 (US);
G06F11/0775 (US);
G06F11/085 (US);
G06F13/12 (KR);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0635 (US);
G06F3/0689 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZURÜCKGEGEBENE DATEN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINER START-SUBKANAL-ANWEISUNG | [2013/24] | English: | DATA RETURNED RESPONSIVE TO EXECUTING A START SUBCHANNEL INSTRUCTION | [2013/24] | French: | DONNÉES RENVOYÉES EN RÉPONSE À L'EXÉCUTION D'UNE INSTRUCTION DE DÉMARRAGE DE SOUS-CANAL | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 26.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.10.2013 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | RS | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | SM | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | IE | 25.05.2014 | LU | 25.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
IE | 25.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 25.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | NO | 23.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5377337 (ANTOGNINI JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 13, line 9 - column 23, line 20; figures 9-12 *; | [A]US5459864 (BRENT GLEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0549924 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5377337 | US5442802 | US5526484 | US5551013 | US6009261 | US5574873 | US6308255 | US6463582 | US5790825 |