EP2709794 - METHOD FOR SCANNING A TUBE INTENDED TO BE WORKED ON A LASER CUTTING MACHINE USING A SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE RADIATION REFLECTED OR EMITTED BY THE TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/13] | METHOD FOR SCANNING A TUBE INTENDED TO BE WORKED ON A LASER CUTTING MACHINE USING A SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE RADIATION REFLECTED OR EMITTED BY THE TUBE | ||
[2015/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adige S.p.A. Via per Barco, 11 38056 Levico Terme (TN) / IT | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Adige S.p.A. Via Per Barco, 11 38056 Levico Terme / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALVAGNINI, Paolo Via Matalon 13 I-38060 NOGAREDO (Trento) / IT | 02 /
NICOLETTI, Sergio Via Gianettini 15/B I-38056 LEVICO TERME (Trento) / IT | 03 /
BRIGADUE, Matteo Via Pec 15 I-38043 BEDOLLO (Trento) / IT | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2016/09] |
Former [2014/13] | Rondano, Davide, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12729210.0 | 14.05.2012 | [2016/09] | WO2012IB52388 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00425 | 12.05.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110425 | [2014/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012153315 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709794 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2709794 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, B23K26/08, B23K26/03, G01B11/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B23K26/702 (US);
B23K26/03 (KR,RU);
B23K26/08 (RU);
B23K26/082 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABTASTEN EINES ROHRES ZUM BEARBEITEN IN EINER LASERSCHNEIDANLAGE MIT EINEM SENSOR ZUM MESSEN DER VON DER RÖHRE REFLEKTIERTEN BZW. EMITTIERTEN STRAHLUNG | [2014/13] | English: | METHOD FOR SCANNING A TUBE INTENDED TO BE WORKED ON A LASER CUTTING MACHINE USING A SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE RADIATION REFLECTED OR EMITTED BY THE TUBE | [2015/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE BALAYAGE D'UN TUBE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE TRAVAILLÉ SUR UNE MACHINE DE DECOUPE LASER, UTILISANT UN CAPTEUR POUR MESURER LE RAYONNEMENT RÉFLÉCHI OU ÉMIS PAR CE TUBE | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/13] | METHOD FOR SCANNING A TUBE INTENDED TO BE WORKED ON A LASER CUTTING MACHINE USING A SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE RADIATION REFLECTED OR EMITTED BY THE TUBE | ||
Former [2014/13] | PROCÉDÉ POUR BALAYER UN TUBE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE TRAVAILLÉ SUR UNE MACHINE DE COUPE AU LASER QUI UTILISE UN CAPTEUR POUR MESURER LE RAYONNEMENT RÉFLÉCHI OU ÉMIS PAR CE TUBE | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.03.2016 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | RS | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | IE | 14.05.2016 | LU | 14.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 14.05.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 02.03.2016 | |
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01273683 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0760469 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]JP2000117468 (FUISUTO KK) [Y] 2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0021] - [0022] * [A] 3; | [A]US2009110265 (RAJENDRAN SANKERLINGAM [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0024]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2010125517 (KOMATSU NTC LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * |