EP2710015 - POLYMORPH OF RIFAXIMIN AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarochem Ireland Limited Damastown, Mulhuddard Dublin 15 / IE | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGANO', Enrico Via S. Andrea 8 22040 Lurago d'Erba / IT | 02 /
MOLTENI, Renato Via Maestri Comacini 12 22044 Inverigo / IT | 03 /
LANFRANCONI, Simona Via Bellini 9 22070 Montano Lucino / IT | 04 /
ARRIGHI, Massimiliano Via Michelangelo 6 22070 Luisago / IT | 05 /
GATTI, Fabio Via Varesina 92 22075 Lurate Caccivio / IT | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12731691.7 | 18.05.2012 | [2016/20] | WO2012IB52506 | Priority number, date | IT2011MI00890 | 19.05.2011 Original published format: IT MI20110890 | [2014/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156951 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710015 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2710015 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/22, A61K31/395, A61P1/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
C07D498/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/439 (KR,US);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP,KR);
C07B2200/13 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RIFAXIMIN-POLYMORPH UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2014/13] | English: | POLYMORPH OF RIFAXIMIN AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2014/13] | French: | POLYMORPHE DE LA RIFAXIMINE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRÉPARATION | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2012 | AL | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LU | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2005101598 (VISCOMI GIUSEPPE C [IT], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-3; claims 1, 3, 5 *; | [I]EP1698630 (ALFA WASSERMANN SPA [IT]) [I] 1-13 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [I]WO2009108730 (SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [I]US2010174064 (GUSHURST KAREN S [US], et al) [I] 1-13* claim 1 * | by applicant | US4341785 | EP1557421 | WO2006094662 | WO2009108730 |