EP2731460 - FORMULATION OF TRANSPARENT AND NUTRITIVE MICROEMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prayon Rue Joseph Wauters 144 4480 Engis / BE | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROZE, Guy Rue des Enfants 2 B-4460 Grace Hollogne / BE | 02 /
PUCCI, Claire Allée des Demoiselles 1 F-78290 Croissy Sur Seine / FR | 03 /
NAVARRO, Adeline 5 rue des Hauts de Montbel 69390 Vourles / FR | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Coulon, Ludivine, et al Gevers Patents Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2014/21] | Application number, filing date | 12735531.1 | 13.07.2012 | WO2012EP63836 | Priority number, date | BE20110000456 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: BE 201100456 | [2014/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010956 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2731460 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/303, A61K9/107, A23L2/52, A23L1/22 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/155 (EP,CN,US);
A61P3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNG VON TRANSPARENTEN UND NÄHRSTOFFREICHEN MIKROEMULSIONEN | [2014/21] | English: | FORMULATION OF TRANSPARENT AND NUTRITIVE MICROEMULSIONS | [2014/21] | French: | FORMULATION DE MICROEMULSIONS TRANSPARENTES ET NUTRITIVES | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]FR2787348 (ARCANE IND [FR]) [I] 1-8,13-18 * page 2, lines 20-30 * * page 3, lines 14-32 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 16 * * page 5, line 29 * * page 6, lines 14-28 * * page 8, lines 1-4,25-26 * * examples 1-9 * * claims 1-2 * [A] 9-12; | [A]US2002187238 (VLAD FLORIN [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0010] - [0012] - [0018] - [0024] , [0028] , [0030] * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US2003228395 (GARTI NISSIM [IL], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0015] , [0030] - [0034] * * tables 1-3 *; | [A]US2004086619 (ZHONG YUANZHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0013] - [0014] - [0043] - [0044] *; | [AD]US2007087104 (CHANAMAI RATJIKA [US]) [AD] 1-18 * paragraphs [0025] - [0036] - [0045] - [4750] - [0052] * * examples 1-10 *; | [A]CN101766261 (GUANGDONG DAHUANONG ANIMAL HEA) [A] 1-18 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0012] , [0018] * | Examination | WO9419000 | by applicant | US2007087104 |