EP2732576 - VARIABLE-LENGTH NONCE GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Likai 5 Cambridge Center 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12738000.4 | 13.07.2012 | WO2012US46765 | Priority number, date | US201113183028 | 14.07.2011 Original published format: US201113183028 | US201113245812 | 26.09.2011 Original published format: US201113245812 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010125 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732576 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04L9/3213 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON ZUFALLSZAHLEN MIT VARIABLER LÄNGE | [2014/21] | English: | VARIABLE-LENGTH NONCE GENERATION | [2014/21] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UN NOMBRE ALÉATOIRE DE LONGUEUR VARIABLE | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 04.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 04.09.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5151697 (BUNTON SUZANNE [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** column 1, line 61 - column 6, line 4 *; | [XY]GB2334653 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-10,13-15,18-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * [Y] 5,11,12,16,17; | [Y] - Jeff Bloom ET AL, "What is the best way to generate a unique and short file name in Java", http://stackoverflow.com/, (20090506), URL: http://stackoverflow.com/questions/825678/what-is-the-best-way-to-generate-a-unique-and-short-file-name-in-java, (20121008), XP055040288 [Y] 5,11,12,16,17 * the whole document * |