EP2731703 - FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR WITH A REACTION ZONE ET A CONTINUOUS CATALYST FLUIDIZED BED REGENERATION SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/21] | CONTINUOUS CATALYST REGENERATION IN A FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR | ||
[2017/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2017/34] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Arkema France 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Jean-Luc 190 Rue du Coteau F-69390 Millery / FR | 02 /
PATIENCE, Grégory 107 Vivian Avenue Ville Mont-Royal, Québec H3P 1N8 / CA | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12744067.5 | 09.07.2012 | [2017/34] | WO2012FR51617 | Priority number, date | FR20110056312 | 12.07.2011 Original published format: FR 1156312 | [2014/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013007941 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2731703 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2731703 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/18, B01J8/38, B01J8/22, B01J38/30, B01J23/92, B01J27/28, C07C45/38, C07C45/52, C07C46/06, C07C47/22, C07C51/235, C07C51/265, C07C51/31, C07C51/377, C07C57/04, C07C57/145, C07C63/16, C07C63/26, C07C51/215 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
B01J8/0055 (EP,US);
B01J8/24 (US);
B01J23/92 (EP,US);
B01J27/285 (EP,US);
B01J38/30 (EP,US);
B01J8/1818 (EP,US);
B01J8/1827 (EP,US);
B01J8/1836 (EP,US);
B01J8/226 (EP,US);
B01J8/386 (EP,US);
C07C45/38 (EP,US);
C07C45/52 (EP,US);
C07C51/215 (EP,US);
C07C51/235 (EP,US);
C07C51/265 (EP,US);
C07C51/313 (EP,US);
C07C51/377 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00141 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00203 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00557 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0084 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/38, C07C47/06 (EP,US);
C07C45/52, C07C47/22 (US,EP);
C07C51/215, C07C57/145 (EP,US);
C07C51/235, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
C07C51/265, C07C63/16 (EP,US);
C07C51/265, C07C63/26 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2014/21] | B01J8/00, B01J8/18, B01J8/38, B01J8/22, B01J38/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLIESSBETTREAKTOR MIT EINER REAKTIONSZONE UND EINER KONTINUIERLICHEN KATALYSATORREGENERATIONSZONE IN EINEM FLIESSBETTREAKTOR | [2017/22] | English: | FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR WITH A REACTION ZONE ET A CONTINUOUS CATALYST FLUIDIZED BED REGENERATION SECTION | [2017/22] | French: | RÉACTEUR A LIT FLUIDISÉ COMPRENANT UNE ZONE DE RÉACTION ET UNE ZONE DE RÉGÉNÉRATION DE CATALYSEUR CONTINUE EN LIT FLUIDISÉ | [2017/22] |
Former [2014/21] | KONTINUIERLICHE KATALYSATORREGENERATION IN EINEM FLIESSBETTREAKTOR | ||
Former [2014/21] | CONTINUOUS CATALYST REGENERATION IN A FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR | ||
Former [2014/21] | REGENERATION DE CATALYSEUR EN CONTINU DANS UN REACTEUR A LIT FLUIDISE | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 31.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2012 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | MT | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.07.2012 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
MT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.07.2012 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2477751 (JOHNSON EVERETT A) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US2698281 (LEFFER FREDERICK A W) [I] 1-11 * column 1, lines 16-32 * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 61 * * figure * * column 8, lines 18-20 *; | [I]US2872472 (FENSKE MERRELL R, et al) [I] 1-11 * column 1, lines 15-27 * * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 35 * * column 16, lines 32-36 * * figure 1; table 4 *; | [I]US3057923 (MICHEL HELLIN, et al) [I] 1-11 * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 54 * * figure 12 *; | [A]US3669877 (FRIEDRICH HEINZ G) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [IA]US4623443 (WASHER STONE P [US]) [I] 1-6 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 6 * * figure 1 * [A] 7-11; | [I]US2003073751 (CULROSS CLAUDE CLARENCE [US]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] - [0025] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2920767 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [A] 7-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009156655 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 7-11* the whole document * | by applicant | US2872472 | US3057923 | US4623443 | EP0340852 | US6437208 | US2003073751 | WO2006087083 | US2007203383 | EP1848681 | WO2009012855 | WO2009044081 | US2010028224 | WO2010046227 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Hydrodynamics of a novel biomass autothermal fast pyrolysis reactor: flow pattern and pressure drop", CHEM. ENG. TECHNOL., (2009), vol. 32, pages 27 - 37 |