EP2673698 - MULTIMODAL TOUCHSCREEN INTERACTION APPARATUSES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haworth, Inc. One Haworth Center Holland, MI 49423 / US | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGGERTY, Ammon 12 Westwood Ct. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12744926.2 | 08.02.2012 | WO2012US24350 | Priority number, date | US201161440591P | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161440591 P | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012109368 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673698 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
G06F3/0354 (KR);
G06F3/03545 (KR);
G06F3/041 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR MULTIMODALE BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM-INTERAKTION | [2013/51] | English: | MULTIMODAL TOUCHSCREEN INTERACTION APPARATUSES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2013/51] | French: | APPAREILS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'INTERACTION MULTIMODE AVEC UN ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 27.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010309148 (FLEIZACH CHRISTOPHER BRIAN [US], et al); | [X]US2006012580 (PERSKI HAIM [IL], et al); | [A]US2009128516 (RIMON ORI [IL], et al) |