EP2677487 - OPERATOR SELECTION DEVICE, OPERATOR SELECTION PROGRAM, AND OPERATOR SELECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUMA, Mikio c/o FUJITSU SYSTEM EAST LIMITED 2-28-8 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | 02 /
KAWASAKI, Mitsuhiro c/o FUJITSU SYSTEM EASTLIMITED 2-28-8 Honkomagome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12746671.2 | 07.02.2012 | WO2012JP52781 | Priority number, date | JP20110030083 | 15.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011030083 | [2013/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012111489 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677487 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/14, G06Q50/10, G06Q10/02 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
H04M3/5233 (US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | G06Q50/14, G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | BEDIENERAUSWAHLVORRICHTUNG, BEDIENERAUSWAHLPROGRAMM UND BEDIENERAUSWAHLVERFAHREN | [2013/52] | English: | OPERATOR SELECTION DEVICE, OPERATOR SELECTION PROGRAM, AND OPERATOR SELECTION METHOD | [2013/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION D'OPÉRATEUR, PROGRAMME DE SÉLECTION D'OPÉRATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION D'OPÉRATEUR | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | Translation filed | 13.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 28.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2151797 (AVAYA INC [US]) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] ** paragraph [0089] * | International search | [Y]JP2001111696 (KOMAI RYOICHI); | [A]JP2002083086 (KUMASAKA KENJI); | [A]JP2002117152 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2002543499 (DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUR LUFT-UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.); | [A]JP2003006293 (MYTRIP NET KK); | [A]JP2003114887 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003187061 (FUJI MACHINE MFG); | [Y]JP2005275924 (DOCOMO MOBILE INC); | [A]JP2006155546 (CENTURY RIYUU KIKAKU KK); | [Y]JP2006245678 (IDEIA KK) |