EP2758162 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF PEROXOMONOSULPHURIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/01] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STESEL, Peter 98 Mountbatten Place Dinsdale, Hamilton 3204 / NZ | 02 /
TOWNSEND, Darren 9 Victoria Ave. Morrinsville Morrinsville 3300 / NZ | 03 /
BARRATT, Thomas 1 Omokoroa Road Omokoroa 3114 / NZ | [2014/31] | Application number, filing date | 12759472.9 | 19.09.2012 | [2018/01] | WO2012EP68391 | Priority number, date | EP20110182103 | 21.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11182103 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041546 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758162 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2758162 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, B01J14/00, C01B15/06 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
B01J14/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/244 (EP,US);
C01B15/06 (US);
C01B15/08 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERDÜNNTEN WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNG AUS PEROXOMONOSCHWEFELSÄURE | [2018/01] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTION OF PEROXOMONOSULPHURIC ACID | [2014/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE DILUÉE D'ACIDE PEROXOMONOSULFURIQUE | [2014/31] |
Former [2014/31] | VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERDÜNNTEN WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNG AUS PEROXOMONOSCHWEFELSÄURE | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | LU | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | HR | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | LT | 03.01.2018 | |
NL | 03.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5439663 (MANGANARO JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 2, lines 47-64 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 47; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5304360 (LANE JOHN R G [GB], et al) [AD] 1-9 * column 1, lines 4-6 * * column 3, lines 9-65 * * column 4, lines 26-36 * * column 6, lines 49-55 * * column 8, lines 31-57; figure 1 * | Examination | US5879653 | by applicant | US2789954 | WO9207791 |