EP2758171 - METHOD FOR THE PHOTOCATALYTICALLY ACTIVE COATING OF SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Helmut-Schmidt-Universität/ Universität der Bundeswehr Hamburg Holstenhofweg 85 22043 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Hamburg Innovation GmbH Harburger Schloßstrasse 6-12 21079 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIEMANN, Jan-Oliver Lutterothstrasse 56 20255 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
GUTZMANN, Henning Dringsheide 33 22119 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
KLASSEN, Thomas Schäferstieg 2 21465 Wentorf / DE | 04 /
GÄRTNER, Frank Schiffbeker Weg 308 22043 Hamburg / DE | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12766621.2 | 18.09.2012 | WO2012EP68296 | Priority number, date | DE20111083054 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011083054 | [2014/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041506 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758171 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/00, B01J37/02, C23C4/06, C23C4/10, C23C14/02, C23C16/02, C23C24/04, B01J21/06 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
C23C14/025 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0217 (EP,US);
B01J37/0225 (EP,US);
B01J37/0238 (EP,US);
B01J37/348 (EP,US);
B01J37/349 (EP,US);
C23C16/0281 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
C23C4/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PHOTOKATALYTISCH AKTIVEN BESCHICHTUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [2014/31] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PHOTOCATALYTICALLY ACTIVE COATING OF SURFACES | [2014/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT D'UN REVÊTEMENT AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ PHOTOCATALYTIQUE SUR DES SURFACES | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 14.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000131513 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]KR20050109003 (UNIV KOREA POLYTECHNIC [KR]); | [XY]EP1652963 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [Y]US2007110919 (BALLHORN REINHARD [DE], et al); | [YD]DE102009043319 (HELMUT SCHMIDT UNI UNI DER BUNDESWEHR HAMBURG [DE]); | [E]WO2012136127 (MILL RICH LTD [CN], et al) | by applicant | DE102004038795 | DE102005053263 | DE102009043319 |