blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2694253

EP2694253 - ROTARY IMPACT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ingersoll-Rand Company
800-D Beaty Street
Davidson, NC 28036 / US
[2019/23]
Former [2014/09]For all designated states
Ingersoll-Rand Company
800-D Beaty Street
Davidson, NC 28036 / US
Former [2014/07]For all designated states
Ingersoll Rand Company
155 Chestnut Ridge Road
Montvale, New Jersey 07645 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SEITH, Warren, Andrew
4990 Harvey Road
Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US
02 / AMEND, Ryan, Scott
4245 Crosswinds
Bethlehem, PA 18045 / US
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
One Portwall Square
Portwall Lane
Bristol BS1 6BH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2014/07]Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12767994.204.04.2012
[2019/23]
WO2012US32116
Priority number, dateUS20111308003005.04.2011         Original published format: US201113080030
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2012138721
Date:11.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2694253
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2694253
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:B25B23/00, B25B21/02
[2018/16]
CPC:
B25B21/026 (EP,US); B25B21/02 (US); B25B13/06 (US);
B25B23/0035 (US)
Former IPC [2015/26]B25D17/00, B25B21/02
Former IPC [2014/07]B25D17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KRAFTSCHRAUBERVORRICHTUNG[2014/07]
English:ROTARY IMPACT DEVICE[2014/07]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPACT ROTATIF[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2013National basic fee paid 
04.11.2013Search fee paid 
04.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2019Fee for grant paid
23.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2017
Opposition(s)06.03.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201403   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2014
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.04.2012
AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
MK05.06.2019
MT05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU04.04.2012
AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CY05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
MT05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/52]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
MC05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/25]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
PL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SI05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/22]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
DK05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
TR05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]DE940877  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,8 * page 2, lines 69-123 *;
 [X]GB930816  (MEUDON FORGES ATEL) [X] 1,8 * page 2, lines 69-80; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4157120  (ANDERSON J EDWARD C [US]) [A] 1,8* abstract *;
 [X]GB2443399  (MOBILETRON ELECTRONICS CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,4,6-8,11 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 12; figures 4-7 *;
 [X]WO2011017066  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036] *
International search[Y]US338146  (GRAMERA);
 [Y]US2301860  (DOANE HARRY C);
 [Y]US2969660  (DALE WILLIAM S, et al);
 [Y]US5328308  (DUCKER III ANDREW L [US], et al);
 [A]US2010000750  (ANDEL BENJAMIN [DE]);
 [A]US2011056714  (ELGER WILLIAM A [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.