EP2696800 - POLYAXIAL DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jbsg Management LLC 2141 South Standard Avenue Santa Ana, CA 92707 / US | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCBRIDE, Jim 3250 Horizon Street Corona CA 92881 / US | 02 /
COVARRUBIAS, Gonzalo 26801 Paseo Atrevida San Juan Capistrano CA 92675 / US | 03 /
TOUBIA, Souhail 27001 Mission Hills Drive San Juan Capistrano CA 92675 / US | 04 /
STAPH, Bradford 34139 Calle La Primavera Dana Point CA 92629 / US | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | inCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | [2019/13] |
Former [2014/08] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 12770600.0 | 13.04.2012 | [2019/13] | WO2012US33668 | Priority number, date | US201161476230P | 15.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161476230 P | US201161487591P | 18.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161487591 P | US201161512366P | 27.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512366 P | US201161545061P | 07.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161545061 P | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012142517 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2696800 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2696800 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
A61C8/0053 (EP,KR,US);
A61C8/0022 (KR,US);
A61C8/006 (EP,KR,US);
A61C8/0074 (EP,KR,US);
A61C8/008 (EP,KR,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | POLYAXIALES ZAHNIMPLANTATSYSTEM | [2014/08] | English: | POLYAXIAL DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM | [2014/08] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT DENTAIRE POLYAXIAL | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2012 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | IE | 13.04.2019 | LU | 13.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.04.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.04.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 13.04.2012 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.04.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.04.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.04.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5302125 (KOWNACKI CHARLES D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 50-63; figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2766354 (PELTIER GUY [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 23-28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009202962 (XAM-MAR MANGRANE ESTEBAN [ES]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009246733 (AUDERSET ADRIAN [CH], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-9 *; | [E]WO2014106761 (ELSNER EDVIN [HU]) [E] 1-7* figures 24,26,28 * | International search | [X]US4713004 (LINKOW LEONARD I [US], et al); | [Y]US5622500 (NIZNICK GERALD A [US]); | [Y]US2009202962 (XAM-MAR MANGRANE ESTEBAN [ES]); | [Y]US2010036427 (WINSLOW CHARLES J [US], et al) | by applicant | US5302125 |