EP2776424 - SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL-BASED CARBOXAMIDE AND UREA DERIVATIVES BEARING A PHENYL MOIETY SUBSTITUTED WITH AN N-CYCLIC GROUP AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK-FOLTYN, Robert Luisenstrasse 28 52070 Aachen / DE | 02 /
CHRISTOPH, Thomas Schilderstrasse 42 52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
DAMANN, Nils Luxemburger Strasse 249 50939 Köln / DE | 04 /
LESCH, Bernhard Korneliusstrasse 59 52076 Aachen / DE | 05 /
BAHRENBERG, Gregor Auf Aderich 38 52156 Monschau-Konzen / DE | 06 /
SAUNDERS, Derek, John Försterstrasse 19 52072 Aachen / DE | 07 /
STOCKHAUSEN, Hannelore Wittscheidter Strasse 6 52393 Hürtgenwald / DE | 08 /
KIM, Yong-Soo 856 Bukbu-dong Yangsan Gyengnam / KR | 09 /
KIM, Myeong-Seop 1330 (2/3) Gonggi-ri Buk-myeon Yeongwol-gun Gangw-do / KR | 10 /
LEE, Jeewoo c/o Digitalbiotech Co. Ltd. Building 20 Room 402 College of Pharmacy Seoul National University, Shinlim-Dong, Kwanak-Ku Seoul 151-742 / KR | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Brosch, Oliver, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12781342.6 | 08.11.2012 | WO2012EP72142 | Priority number, date | EP20110008916 | 09.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11008916 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068463 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776424 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/4439, A61P29/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CARBOXAMIDE AUF PYRAZOLYLBASIS UND HARNSTOFFDERIVATE MIT EINEM DURCH EINE N-ZYKLISCHE GRUPPE ALS VANILLOID-REZEPTORLIGANDEN SUBSTITUIERTEN PHENYLTEIL | [2014/38] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL-BASED CARBOXAMIDE AND UREA DERIVATIVES BEARING A PHENYL MOIETY SUBSTITUTED WITH AN N-CYCLIC GROUP AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2014/38] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CARBOXAMIDE ET D'URÉE À BASE DE PYRAZOLYLE SUBSTITUÉ PORTANT UN FRAGMENT PHÉNYLE REMPLACÉ PAR UN GROUPE N-CYCLIQUE COMME LIGANDS DES RÉCEPTEURS VANILLOÏDES | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2014 | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2010127856 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * examples 55,144; claim - * | by applicant | WO2010127855 | WO2010127856 | - BENNETT, G.J.; XIE, Y.K., "A peripheral mononeuropathy in rat that produces disorders of pain sensation like those seen in man", PAIN, (1988), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(88)90209-6, pages 87 - 107, XP024378950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(88)90209-6 | - KIM, S.H.; CHUNG, J.M., "An experimental model for peripheral neuropathy produced by segmental spinal nerve ligation in the rat", PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9, pages 355 - 363, XP024378108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(92)90041-9 | - D'AMOUR; SMITH, J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (1941), vol. 72, pages 74 - 79 | - D. DUBUISSON ET AL., PAIN, (1977), vol. 4, pages 161 - 174 | - CHENG; PRUSOFF, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, pages 3099 - 3108 |