EP2773338 - IMPROVING RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROENENDIJK, Martine Mazurkastraat 50 NL-2992 GP Barendrecht / NL | 02 /
BONGERS, Anke Schubertweg 45 NL-3906 BD Veenendaal / NL | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 12783360.6 | 30.10.2012 | [2019/06] | WO2012NL50751 | Priority number, date | WO2011NL50737 | 31.10.2011 Original published format: PCT/NL2011/050737 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066165 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773338 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2773338 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/00, A61K31/202, A61K31/7072, A61K31/7068, A61K31/4415, A61K31/14, A61K31/375, A61K31/355, A61K31/714, A61K31/519, A61K31/683, A61K31/685, A61K33/04, A61K45/06, A61K31/706, A61K31/7064, A23L5/00, A23L33/12, A23L33/13 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/7072 (EP,RU,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,RU,US);
A23L33/13 (EP,RU,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/683 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,RU,US);
A61K33/04 (EP,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,RU,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/14, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/683, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/685, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/04, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/322, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/187, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/7056, A23V2250/706, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/712 (US,EP)
(-) |
Former IPC [2014/37] | A61K31/202, A61K31/7072, A61K45/06, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER WIEDERERKENNUNG | [2018/43] | English: | IMPROVING RECOGNITION | [2014/37] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE LA RECONNAISSANCE | [2014/37] |
Former [2014/37] | ERKENNUNGSVERBESSERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.2019
07.11.2019
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2019/50] | 18.11.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.03.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2021 | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.05.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/37] | 01.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2012 | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | LU | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2020 | FI | 30.10.2020 | PL | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | ES | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | SE | 31.10.2020 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/38] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MK | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2020 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
PL | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
SE | 31.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MK | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2020 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
SE | 31.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2020 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
SE | 31.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2020 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
LU | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NO | 06.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009002166 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1, 2 * * example 2 * * page 4, line 6 - line 25 *; | [X]WO2009082203 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 1 ** page 16 * | Examination | - BIRD ET AL, "Fractionation of memory in medial temporal lobe amnesia", NEUROPSYCHOL, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070112), vol. 45, no. 6, ISSN 0028-3932, pages 1160 - 1171, XP005829118 | - SPAAN PAULINE E J ET AL, "Alzheimer's disease versus normal ageing: a review of the efficiency of clinical and experimental memory measures.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200304), Database accession no. NLM12754679 | - WESTERBERG CARMEN E ET AL, "When memory does not fail: familiarity-based recognition in mild cognitive impairment and Alzheimer's disease.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200603), Database accession no. NLM16594780 | - BIRENBAUM M ET AL, "OPEN-ENDED VS. MULTIPLE-CHOICE RESPONSE FORMATS IT DOES MAKE A DIFFERENCE FOR DIAGNOSTIC PURPOSES", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1987), Database accession no. PREV198834090709 | by applicant | WO2009002166 | - HANSSON O; ZETTERBERG H; BUCHHAVE P; LONDOS E; BLENNOW K; MINTHON L, "Association between CSF biomarkers and incipient Alzheimer's disease in patients with mild cognitive impairment: a follow- up study", LANCET NEUROL, (2006), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S1474-4422(06)70355-6, pages 228 - 234, XP024968928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1474-4422(06)70355-6 | - PRATICO D; CLARK CM; LIUN F; LEE VYM; TROJANOWSKI JQ, "Increase in brain oxidative stress in mild cognitive impairment: a possible predictor of Alzheimer disease", ARCH NEUROL, (2002), vol. 59, pages 972 - 976 | - SCHELTENS ET AL., "Efficacy of a medical food in mild Alzheimer'sd isease: A randomized controlled trial", ALZHEIMER'S & DEMENTIA, (2010), vol. 6, pages 1 - 10 | Opposition | WO2009002166 | WO2009082203 | WO2017069613 | - HARRISON, "A neuropsychological test battery for use in Alzheimer disease clinical trials", ARCHIVES OF NEUROLOGY, (20070000), vol. 64, no. 9, pages 1323 - 1329, XP002675391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archneur.64.9.1323 | - MANDLER, "Recognizing: The Judgment of Previous Occurrence", Psychological Review, (19800000), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 252 - 271, XP055648016 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1037/0033-295X.87.3.252 | - WESTERBERG, "When Memory Does Not Fail: Familiarity-Based Recognition in Mild Cognitive Impairment and Alzheimer's Disease", neuropsychology, (20060000), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 193 - 205, XP055648020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1037/0894-4105.20.2.193 | - ANON, "RECOGNITION vs recall", decision science news, (20060000), pages 1 - 3, XP055648021 | - UNCAPHER, "A Roadmap to Brain Mapping:Toward a Functional Map of Human Parietal Cortex", Neuron, (20100715), vol. 67, pages 5 - 8, XP055648024 | - PIHLAJAMAKI, "Evidence of Altered Posteromedial Cortical fMRI Activity in Subjects at Risk for Alzheimer Disease", Alzheimer journal, (03-2010), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 28 - 38, XP055648026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/WAD.0b013e3181a785c9 | - "recall (memory", Wikipedia, (20110000), XP055649019 | - BIRD, "Fractionation of memory in medial temporal lobe amnesia", NEUROPSYCHOLOGIA, (20070000), vol. 45, pages 1160 - 1171, XP005829118 | - Jesus Gomar,, Et al, "Utility of Combinations of Biomarkers, Cognitive Markers, and Risk Factors to Predict Conversion From Mild Cognitive Impairment to Alzheimer Disease in Patients in the Alzheimer's Disease Neuroimaging Initiative", ARCH GEN PSYCHIATRY, (20110000), vol. 68, no. 9, pages 961 - 969, XP055649045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archgenpsychiatry.2011.96 | - "Souvenaid", nutricia, (20110000), pages 1 - 2, XP055649049 | - SCHELTENS, "Efficacy of a medical food in mild Alzheimer's disease: A randomized, controlled trial", THE JOURNAL OF THE ALZHEIMER' SASSOCIATION, (20100000), XP026829790 | - HOLGUIN, "Dietary uridine enhances the improvement in learning and memory produced by administering DHA to gerbils", The FASEB Journal, (20080000), vol. 22, no. 11, XP055006757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.08-112425 | - ARENSAULT, "DHA Improves Cognition and Prevents Dysfunction of Entorhinal Cortex Neurons in 3xTg-AD Mice", plos one, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 1 - 16, XP055649059 | - WURTMAN, "Synapse formation is enhanced by oral administration of uridine and DHA, the circulating precursors of brain phosphatides", The Journal of Nutrition, Health and Aging, (20090000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 189 - 197, XP055061925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12603-009-0056-3 |