EP2786047 - ACTIVATION APPARATUS FOR A TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2017/09] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDNER, Matthias Martinsriederstr. 15b 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 02 /
TILLE, Thomas Rieneckerstr. 4 81249 München / DE | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 12786906.3 | 05.11.2012 | [2017/09] | WO2012EP71781 | Priority number, date | DE20111087162 | 28.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011087162 | [2014/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013079274 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786047 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2786047 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/10, F16H61/18 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
F16H59/105 (EP,CN,US);
F16H61/18 (EP,CN,US);
F16H2059/0221 (US);
Y10T74/2003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN GETRIEBE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2014/41] | English: | ACTIVATION APPARATUS FOR A TRANSMISSION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2014/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT DE LA BOÎTE DE VITESSES D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2012 | AL | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | MT | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | RS | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | AT | 05.11.2017 | IE | 05.11.2017 | LU | 05.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
TR | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
AT | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MT | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RS | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10208387 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0016] , [0037] - [0039] * * figures 1,5A-5C * [I] 3,6,9,10; | [XI]JP2007030762 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * [I] 3,9,10; | [XI]DE102005047891 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6,9,10; | [XI]JP2008155727 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * abstract *[I] 10 |