EP2711361 - NITROGENATED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND AGRICULTURAL OR HORTICULTURAL FUNGICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBAYAMA Kotaro c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 02 /
KUWAHARA Raito c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 03 /
SATO Motoaki c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 04 /
NISHIMURA Satoshi c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 05 /
SHIINOKI Yasuyuki c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 06 /
YOKOYAMA Masahiro c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | 07 /
KITAMURA Juri c/o Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co. Ltd. 345 Takada Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250-0280 / JP | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/13] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12790304.5 | 17.05.2012 | [2016/26] | WO2012JP62618 | Priority number, date | JP20110113174 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011113174 | JP20110143478 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011143478 | JP20110254368 | 21.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011254368 | JP20110274141 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011274141 | [2014/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012161071 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711361 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2711361 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/52, A01N43/42, A01N43/60, A01N43/90, A01P3/00, C07D401/12, C07D471/04 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A01N43/60 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
A01N43/42 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C07D241/38 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C07D241/44 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C07D241/52 (BR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,BR,CN,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,BR,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | 12.11.2013 | ME | 12.11.2013 | Title | German: | NITROGENIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG SOWIE BAKTERIZID-WIRKSTOFF FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFT UND GARTENBAU | [2014/13] | English: | NITROGENATED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND AGRICULTURAL OR HORTICULTURAL FUNGICIDE | [2014/13] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE AZOTÉ ET AGENT BACTÉRICIDE AGRICOLE OU HORTICOLE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2013 | Translation filed | 12.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | [2018/06] |
Former [2017/13] | SM | 29.06.2016 | |
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | IS | 29.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4533381 (TURNER JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-7* example - *; | [A]EP0860433 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]) [A] 1-7 * example - * | International search | [X]JPH0532639 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO, et al); | [A]JPH05148235 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2005522428 (ASTRA ZENECA AB.); | [XP]WO2011081174 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP], et al); | [X] - ERDOGMUS A ET AL., "Synthesis, photophysics and photochemistry of novel tetra(quinoxalinyl)phthalocyaninato zinc(II) complexes", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY A: CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 205, pages 12 - 18, XP026150458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotochem.2009.04.007 | [X] - ZHOU N ET AL., "3-Acrylamide-4-aryloxyindoles: Synthesis, biological evaluation and metabolic stability of potent and selective EP3 receptor antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2009), vol. 19, pages 1528 - 1531, XP025994311 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.12.112 | by applicant | JPS5892690 | JPH05148235 | US5578596 | WO2005070917 | WO2007011022 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 93 - 101 |