EP2791366 - BRADYRHIZOBIUM STRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes Bioag A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | For all designated states Novozymes Biologicals, Inc. 5400 Corporate Circle Salem, VA 24153 / US | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Yaowei 225 Windsor Dr. Christiansburg, VA 24073 / US | 02 /
TRAN, Anh 4806 Golfview Dr. Roanoke, VA 24019 / US | 03 /
SEMONES, Shawn 612 Crestwood Dr. Salem, VA 24153 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Rasmussen, Preben, et al Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/43] | Rasmussen, Preben Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 12805902.9 | 17.12.2012 | [2017/17] | WO2012US70036 | Priority number, date | US201161576470P | 16.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161576470 P | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013090884 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791366 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2791366 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12R1/01, A01H3/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A01N63/20 (EP,US);
A01H3/00 (EP,RU,US);
A01N63/10 (RU);
C12N1/20 (EP,RU,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,RU,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRADYRHIZOBIUM STÄMME | [2016/47] | English: | BRADYRHIZOBIUM STRAINS | [2014/43] | French: | SOUCHES DE BRADYRHIZOBIUM | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/43] | BRADYRHIZOBIUM-STÄMME | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2012 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 17.12.2017 | LU | 17.12.2017 | MT | 17.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0004778 (BIOS AGRICULTURE INC [CA], et al) [A] 3-8 * the whole document *; | [I] - SUGAWARA MASAYUKI ET AL, "Functional Role of Bradyrhizobium japonicum Trehalose Biosynthesis and Metabolism Genes during Physiological Stress and Nodulation", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (201002), vol. 76, no. 4, pages 1071 - 1081, XP002694519 [I] 1-20 * Whole doc., in particular abstract, p.1077, col.2, discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02483-09 | [I] - STREETER J G, "Effect of trehalose on survival of Bradyrhizobium japonicum during desiccation.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY 2003, (2003), vol. 95, no. 3, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 484 - 491, XP002694520 [I] 1-20 * Whole doc., in particular abstract, p.490, bottom col.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/J.1365-2672.2003.02017.X | [A] - CYTRYN EDDIE J ET AL, "Transcriptional and physiological responses of Bradyrhizobium japonicum to desiccation-induced stress.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY OCT 2007, (200710), vol. 189, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 6751 - 6762, XP002694521 [A] 1-20 * Whole doc., in particular abstract, p.6751, col.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00533-07 | [I] - MARY P ET AL, "Differences among Rhizobium meliloti and Bradyrhizobium japonicum strains in tolerance to desiccation and storage at different relative humidities", SOIL BIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 26, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0038-0717(94)90134-1, ISSN 0038-0717, (19940901), pages 1125 - 1132, (19940901), XP023671147 [I] 1-20 * Whole doc., in particular Fig.2, discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-0717(94)90134-1 | [A] - ZAHRAN H H, "Rhizobia from wild legumes: diversity, taxonomy, ecology, nitrogen fixation and biotechnology.", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY 4 OCT 2001, (20011004), vol. 91, no. 2-3, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 143 - 153, XP002694522 [A] 1-20 * Whole doc., in particular p.145, section starting p.149 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(01)00342-X | [A] - DEAKER ET AL, "Desiccation tolerance of rhizobia when protected by synthetic polymers", SOIL BIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (20061129), vol. 39, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SOILBIO.2006.09.005, ISSN 0038-0717, pages 573 - 580, XP005783610 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.soilbio.2006.09.005 | [A] - LEPRINCE O ET AL, "Desiccation tolerance: From genomics to the field", PLANT SCIENCE, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, vol. 179, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.PLANTSCI.2010.02.011, ISSN 0168-9452, (20101201), pages 554 - 564, (20100224), XP027449540 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plantsci.2010.02.011 | [A] - SUPANJANI S ET AL, "Nod factor enhances calcium uptake by soybean", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, GAUTHIER-VILLARS, PARIS, FR, vol. 44, no. 11-12, ISSN 0981-9428, (20061101), pages 866 - 872, (20061101), XP027963384 [A] 3-8 * the whole document * | [A] - MABOOD F ET AL, "Methyl jasmonate, alone or in combination with genistein, and Bradyrhizobium japonicum increases soybean (Glycine max L.) plant dry matter production and grain yield under short season conditions", FIELD CROPS RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 95, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.FCR.2005.04.013, ISSN 0378-4290, (20060215), pages 412 - 419, (20060215), XP024938505 [A] 3,4,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fcr.2005.04.013 | by applicant | US4536207 | US5175149 | US5321011 | US5545718 | US5549718 | US5702752 | US5965545 | US5990291 | US6146668 | WO2005063784 | US7576213 | WO2010049751 | - DENISON, R. F., THE AMER. NATURALIST., (2000), vol. 156, no. 6, pages 567 - 576 | - MCDERMOTT T.R.; GRAHAM ,P.H., APPL. AND ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., vol. 55, no. 10, pages 2493 - 2498 | - JOHNSTON, A.W.B. ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL, (1974), vol. 87, pages 343 - 350 | - DUNHAM, D. H.; BALDWIN, I.L., SOIL SCIENCE, (1931), vol. 32, pages 235 - 249 | - JOHNSON, H.W. ET AL., AGRONO. J., (1963), vol. 55, pages 269 - 271 | - DUDMAN, W.F.; BROCKWELL, J., AGRICUL. RES., (1968), vol. 19, pages 739 - 747 | - NICOL, H.; THORTON, H.G., PROC. ROY. SOC. B, (1941), vol. 130, pages 32 - 59 | - HUGHES, D.Q.; VINCENT, J.M., PROC. OF THE LINNENAN SOC. OF NEW SOUTH WALES, (1942), vol. 67, pages 142 - 152 | - VINCENT, J.M.; WATERS, L.M., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1953), vol. 9, pages 357 - 370 | - CREGAN, P.B. ET AL., APPL. AND ENVIRO. MICROBIOL., (1989), vol. 55, no. 10, pages 2532 - 2536 | - STACKEBRANDT E ET AL., "Report of the ad hoc committee for the re-evaluation of the species definition in bacteriology", INT J SYST EVOL MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 1043 - 7 | - FRIESEN T.; HILL G.; PUGSLEY T.; HOLLOWAY G; ZIMMERMAN D., "Experimental determination of viability loss of Penicillium bilaiae conidia during convective air-drying", APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1007/s00253-004-1866-1, pages 397 - 404, XP019331913 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-004-1866-1 | - SPAINK, CRIT. REV. PLANT SCI., (2000), vol. 54, pages 257 - 288 | - D'HAEZE ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, pages 79R - 105R | - SAMAIN ET AL., CARB. RES., (1997), vol. 302, pages 35 - 42 | - SAMAIN ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 72, pages 33 - 47 | - HOLST ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 11, pages 608 - 616 | - ROBINA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, pages 521 - 530 | - HANEL ET AL., PLANTA, (2010), vol. 232, pages 787 - 806 | - "The Molecular Immunology of Complex Carbohydrates", ROUGE ET AL., Advances in Experimental Medicine and Biology, SPRINGER SCIENCE | - WAN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2009), vol. 21, pages 1053 - 69 | - DEMONT-CAULET ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 120, no. 1, pages 83 - 92 | - COTTAZ ET AL., METH. ENG., (2005), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 311 - 7 | - POCHANAVANICH ET AL., LETT. APPL. MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 35, pages 17 - 21 | - JAIN ET AL., J. PLANT BIOCHEM. & BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 11, pages 1 - 10 | - SHAW ET AL., ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 11, pages 1867 - 80 | - RALSTON ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 137, pages 1375 - 88 | - MABOOD; FAZLI, "Linoleic and linolenic acid induce the expression of nod genes in Bradyrhizobiumjaponicum", USDA, (20010517), vol. 3 | - HALFORD, "Smoke Signals", CHEM. ENG. NEWS, (20100412), pages 37 - 38 | - POUCI ET AL., AM. J. AGRI. & BIOL. SCI., (2008), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 299 - 314 | WO2012FI00008 |