EP2712109 - CONTROL SIGNALING DETECTION AND SENDING METHODS, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/17] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LV, Yongxia Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xiaofeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHENG, Yan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/17] |
Former [2014/13] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12806895.4 | 02.07.2012 | [2016/17] | WO2012CN78014 | Priority number, date | CN201110189993 | 07.07.2011 Original published format: CN201110189993 | [2014/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013004157 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712109 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712109 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H04L1/0006 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/0689 (EP,US);
H04L1/0027 (EP,US);
H04L1/0031 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERSIGNALISIERUNGSERKENNUNGS- UND SENDEVERFAHREN, BENUTZERGERÄT UND BASISSTATION | [2014/13] | English: | CONTROL SIGNALING DETECTION AND SENDING METHODS, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION ET D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNALISATION DE COMMANDE, ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2013 | Translation filed | 17.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 10.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2012 | AL | 27.04.2016 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | IE | 02.07.2016 | LU | 02.07.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 02.07.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.07.2016 | ||
LU | 02.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.07.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.07.2016 | ||
LU | 02.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.07.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.07.2016 | ||
LU | 02.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.07.2012 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.07.2016 | ||
LU | 02.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.07.2016 | ||
LU | 02.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011019776 (ZHANG GUODONG [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0094]; figure 4 *; | [A] - ZTE, "Aspects on DL control signaling enhancements", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-111521, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110506), vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050491452 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - NORTEL NETWORKS, "Control channel design for the support of wider bandwidth for LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090759 (NT CARRIER AGGREGATION PDCCH), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090204), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20090209 - 20090213, XP050597255 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - RESEARCH IN MOTION ET AL, "PDCCH Enhancement Considerations", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-111661(RIM- PDCCH ENHANCEMENT CONSIDERATION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110503), vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050491288 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101715211 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN101764642 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2011019009 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]CN102076098 (ZTE CORP) |