EP2732356 - MANAGING CONTENT THROUGH ACTIONS ON CONTEXT BASED MENUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTLER, Matthew c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
GIL, Erez Kikin c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SACHIDANANDAM, Vignesh c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
HOCKMAN, Andrew c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
PRATLEY, Christopher c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12810599.6 | 14.07.2012 | WO2012US46826 | Priority number, date | US201161507983P | 14.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161507983 P | US201113284279 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US201113284279 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013010157 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2732356 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04807 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | G06F3/01, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | INHALTSVERWALTUNG DURCH AKTIONEN IN KONTEXTBASIERTEN MENÜS | [2014/21] | English: | MANAGING CONTENT THROUGH ACTIONS ON CONTEXT BASED MENUS | [2014/21] | French: | GESTION DE CONTENU PAR DES ACTIONS SUR DES MENUS CONTEXTUELS | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 21.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2021 | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/31] | 29.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 16.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010192103 (CRAGUN BRIAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 1, 3, 6 * [I] 4,5,7,10-15; | [X]US2010122194 (ROGERS SEAN S [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,11,12 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] *; | [IA] - Dan Heller ET AL, "Motif Programming Manual for OSF/Motif Release 1.2 - Volume Six A - Chapter 16 Menus", http://www.oreilly.com/openbook/motif/vol6a/Vol6a.pdf, ISBN 978-1-56-592016-3, (19930911), pages 431 - 470, URL: http://www.oreilly.com/openbook/motif/vol6a/Vol6a.pdf, (20141217), XP055159275 [I] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15 | International search | [X]US2009309849 (IWEMA MARIEKE ET AL.); | [X]US2009031253 (LEE SEONG CHEOL ET AL.); | [X]US6664991 (CHEE H. CHEW ET AL.); | [A]US2011074828 (CAPELA JAY CHRISTOPHER ET AL.) |