EP2752505 - COPPER FOIL WITH CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 1-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAURA, Tomota c/o Copper Foil Department Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Kazuhiko c/o Copper Foil Department Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/28] | 01 /
NAGAURA, Tomota c/o Copper Foil Department Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Kazuhiko c/o Copper Foil Department Hitachi Works JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 3-1 Shirogane-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | Representative(s) | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/28] | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12829006.1 | 30.08.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012JP72052 | Priority number, date | JP20110189183 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011189183 | [2014/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013031913 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2752505 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2752505 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, B32B15/01, C25D7/06, C25D5/14, C25D1/04, C25D9/08, H05K1/09, C23C28/02, C23C18/16, // C25D3/14, C25D3/16, C25D3/38, C25D3/58, C25D3/56, H05K3/02, C25D11/38 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
C23C18/31 (US);
C23C28/023 (EP,US);
C25D1/04 (EP,US);
C25D3/04 (US);
C25D3/12 (US);
C25D5/14 (EP,US);
C25D7/0614 (EP,US);
C25D9/08 (EP,US);
H05K1/09 (EP,US);
C23C18/165 (EP,US);
C25D11/38 (EP,US);
C25D3/14 (EP,US);
C25D3/16 (EP,US);
C25D3/38 (EP,US);
C25D3/562 (EP,US);
C25D3/565 (EP,US);
C25D3/58 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0317 (US);
H05K2201/032 (US);
H05K2201/0338 (US);
H05K2201/0355 (US);
H05K2203/0307 (EP,US);
H05K3/025 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12438 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12514 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12861 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12882 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12931 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | C23C28/00, B32B15/01, C25D7/06, C25D5/14, C25D1/04, C25D9/08, H05K1/09, // C25D3/14, C25D3/16, C25D3/38, C25D3/58, C25D3/56, H05K3/02, C25D11/38 | ||
Former IPC [2014/28] | C23C28/00, B32B15/01, C25D7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFERFOLIE MIT EINEM TRÄGER | [2014/28] | English: | COPPER FOIL WITH CARRIER | [2014/28] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE POURVUE D'UN SUPPORT | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2013 | Translation filed | 09.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 23.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2012 | AL | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | GB | 30.08.2016 | IE | 30.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004038049 (SUZUKI AKITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0032] , [0066] - [0068] *; | [A]US2005048306 (SUZUKI YUUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 1 *; | [A]US2007154692 (SUZUKI YUUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0202] * * comparative Examples 1 and 2 * * claims 2,4,6 * | International search | [A]JP2010006071 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2002292788 (NIPPON DENKAI KK); | [A]WO0224444 (CIRCUIT FOIL JAPAN [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2010006071 | JP2007007937 |