|
10.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.10.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
26.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2023 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2023 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2023 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2023 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.03.2022 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2022 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.11.2021 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.11.2021 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2021 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.06.2021 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2021 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
114 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.06.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
42 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.06.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
14 |