EP2768428 - DEVICES FOR STENTING AN AIRWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/35] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR STENTING AN AIRWAY | ||
[2016/01] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merit Medical Systems, Inc. 1600 West Merit Parkway South Jordan UT 84095 / US | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIMSKY, William 400 Redland Court Owings Mills, Maryland 21117 / US | 02 /
ELLER, Zeke 3227 McKinney Avenue 20D Dallas, Texas 75204 / US | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Killough, Kieran Paul HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 12841334.1 | 19.10.2012 | WO2012US61067 | Priority number, date | US201161549874P | 21.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161549874 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013059623 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2768428 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04, A61F2/02, A61F2/82, A61F2/86, A61L27/56 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (US);
A61F2002/043 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERLEGUNG EINES STENTS IN EINEM ATEMWEG | [2016/01] | English: | DEVICES FOR STENTING AN AIRWAY | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR IMPLANTER UNE ENDOPROTHÈSE DANS DES VOIES AÉRIENNES | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/35] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERLEGUNG EINES STENTS IN EINEM ATEMWEG | ||
Former [2014/35] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR STENTING AN AIRWAY | ||
Former [2014/35] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR IMPLANTER UNE ENDOPROTHÈSE DANS DES VOIES AÉRIENNES | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 25.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2085050 (TAEWOONG MEDICAL CO LTD [KR]; SHIN KYONG MIN [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0054] - paragraph [0057]; figures 15,18,21 *; | [A]US2010076555 (MARTEN LEWIS H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0086]; figures 12-14 *; | [A]WO9300869 (RUESCH WILLY AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004148032 (RUTTER MICHAEL JOHN [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004148032 (RUTTER, M. ET AL.); | [Y]US2010076555 (MARTEN, L. ET AL.); | [A]US2008046065 (HARTLEY, D. ET AL.); | [A]WO2009125899 (S&G BIOTECH, INC.); | [A]WO2011072084 (AVALON MEDICAL LTD. ET AL.); | [A]US5480431 (FREITAG, L. ET AL.) |