|
30.04.2025 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2025 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2024 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2024 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2024 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2024 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2023 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
18.02.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
35 |
|
18.02.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
35 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.11.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
57 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.10.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
41 |
|
25.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 18 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 19 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 20 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 21 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 22 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
24 |
|
24.09.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
24 |
|
23.09.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
99 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
87 |
|
07.08.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
55 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
26 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
06.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
33 |
|
03.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
37 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Declaration of eligibility for a reduction of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.11.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |