EP2800110 - contactless battery charger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/45] | NON-CONTACT CHARGING DEVICE | ||
[2015/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADAKATA, Hideki c/o Panasonic Corporation, Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Atsushi c/o Panasonic Corporation, Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
BESSYO, Daisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation, Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12861857.6 | 25.12.2012 | WO2012JP08274 | Priority number, date | JP20110286506 | 27.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011286506 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013099221 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800110 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/14, B60L11/18, H02J7/02, H02J5/00, H01F27/28 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
B60L50/52 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (US);
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
H01F27/2823 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H02J7/00304 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (EP,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2270/147 (EP,US);
H01F41/077 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H01F38/14, B60L11/18, H02J7/00, H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | Kontaktlose Batterieladevorrichtung | [2015/45] | English: | contactless battery charger | [2015/45] | French: | Chargeur de batterie sans contact | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/45] | KONTAKTLOSE LADEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/45] | NON-CONTACT CHARGING DEVICE | ||
Former [2014/45] | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT SANS-CONTACT | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2014 | Translation filed | 24.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1606869 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figure 4; claim 3 *; | [A]EP2309522 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2011248573 (KANNO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * | International search | [A]JPH03218611 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2009064856 (TOTOKU ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2011100819 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD); | [A]WO2011125328 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011229202 (PANASONIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2008087733 |