EP2799967 - TOUCH SCREEN UNLOCKING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 70 Huifeng 4th ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Yang Zeng, Hu 70 Huifeng 4th Zhongkai Hi-tech Development District Development Zone Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12862158.8 | 08.10.2012 | WO2012CN82593 | Priority number, date | CN201110447241 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: CN201110447241 | [2014/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013097511 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799967 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, G06F3/0488 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | G06F3/048, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | TOUCHSCREEN-FREIGABEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2014/45] | English: | TOUCH SCREEN UNLOCKING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2014/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉVERROUILLAGE D'ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | Translation filed | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 26.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 24.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/34] | 04.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003098892 (HIIPAKKA JARMO [FI]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2007152984 (ORDING BAS [US], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]US2010079380 (NURMI MIKKO [FI]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1, 3A, 3B, 4 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] *; | [A]US2010269040 (LEE SANG-MIN [KR]) [A] 1-18 * figure 5A * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] *; | [Y] - Thullyo Lima, "Dream Pet Link HACK (ATUALIZADO HD)", (20111216), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=UJddFjcjGcU, (20150703), XP054975959 [Y] 1-18 * see 3:52 min to 4:00 min * | International search | [Y]CN101067830 (TENGXUN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [Y]CN102075619 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD); | [X]CN102270097 (ZTE CORP.); | [XP]CN102566927 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) |