blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2879179

EP2879179 - SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 8 Xihuanzhonglu, BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
[2017/39]
Former [2015/23]For all designated states
Beijing BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 8 Xihuanzhonglu, BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YAN, Changjiang
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / XIE, Zhenyu
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
03 / XU, Shaoying
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
04 / LI, Tiansheng
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2017/39]
Former [2015/23]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date12878648.003.12.2012
[2017/39]
WO2012CN85760
Priority number, dateCN20121026296426.07.2012         Original published format: CN201210262964
[2015/23]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014015607
Date:30.01.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879179
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2879179
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/146, H01L27/12, H01L31/0256, H01L31/105
[2017/17]
CPC:
H01L27/1214 (EP,US); H01L27/14603 (EP,US); H01L27/14616 (EP,US);
H01L27/14632 (EP,US); H01L27/14687 (EP,US); H01L27/14692 (EP,US);
H01L29/66765 (US); H01L29/78669 (US); H01L31/0256 (US);
H01L31/1055 (US); H01L27/14689 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/11]H01L27/146, H01L29/786, H01L27/12, H01L31/0256, H01L31/105
Former IPC [2015/23]H01L27/146, H01L29/786
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2015/23]
English:SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2015/23]
French:CAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2013Translation filed 
19.12.2013National basic fee paid 
19.12.2013Search fee paid 
19.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2013Examination requested  [2015/23]
05.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2017Fee for grant paid
18.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2017
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2012
AL27.09.2017
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MK27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
PT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/28]HU03.12.2012
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MK27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
PT27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2020/16]HU03.12.2012
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MK27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
TR27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2019/51]HU03.12.2012
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
MK27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2019/47]HU03.12.2012
AT27.09.2017
CY27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2019/31]HU03.12.2012
AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2019/30]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
MC27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SI27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
PL27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
DK27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT27.09.2017
CZ27.09.2017
EE27.09.2017
ES27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
IT27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RO27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
SK27.09.2017
SM27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
IS27.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ27.09.2017
FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
LV27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
BG27.12.2017
NO27.12.2017
GR28.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI27.09.2017
HR27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
RS27.09.2017
SE27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI27.09.2017
LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT27.09.2017
NO27.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010163737  (MASUDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0050] - [0053] - [0 62] - [0070] - [0 94] - [0121] * * figures 1a-e, 2a *;
 [Y]US2011024739  (SHU FANG-AN [TW], et al) [Y] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 39] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2009026509  (HAYASHI MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * figures 1, 2 *
International search[A]US6856351  (WEISFIELD RICHARD L [US]);
 [X]CN101086998  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]CN101308856  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]);
 [XP]CN102790067  (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.