EP2888842 - CONGESTION NOTIFICATION IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTORFF, Paul Allen Hewlett-Packard Company 19111 Pruneridge Ave. Cupertino, California 95014-0691 / US | 02 /
GRAVEL, Mark Allen Hewlett-Packard Company 8000 Foothills Blvd. Roseville, California 95747 / US | 03 /
HUDSON, Charles L. Hewlett-Packard Company 14231 Tandem Blvd. Austin, Texas 78728 / US | 04 /
LOW, Stephen G. Hewlett-Packard Company 14231 Tandem Blvd. Austin, Texas 78728 / US | 05 /
KUHNS, Frederick Grant Hewlett-Packard Company 14231 Tandem Blvd. Austin, Texas 78728 / US | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 12883129.4 | 21.08.2012 | WO2012US51735 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014031106 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888842 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/60, H04L29/06, H04L12/801 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04L47/263 (EP,US);
H04L47/25 (US);
H04L47/11 (US);
H04L47/12 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | H04L12/60, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | ÜBERLASTUNGSBENACHRICHTIGUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK | [2015/27] | English: | CONGESTION NOTIFICATION IN A NETWORK | [2015/27] | French: | NOTIFICATION DE CONGESTION DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 08.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6108307 (MCCONNELL STEPHEN M [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 3 - column 9, line 46 *; | [A]US6839321 (CHIRUVOLU GIRISH VSR [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 16-47 * * column 4, line 21 - column 16, line 14 *; | [A]US2011267942 (AYBAY GUNES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0014] - [0093] * | International search | [X]US2007183332 (OH JONG-SANG [KR], et al); | [A]KR20100038687 (KWANGJU INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A] - KOHEI NAKAJIMA, "A congestion control scheme for layer 3 wireless mesh networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH ASIA-PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (APCC 2009)-172, (20061008), pages 722 - 725, XP031597350 |