EP2624119 - Electronic device and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/48] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jaejoon c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu 153-801 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Han, Changeui c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu 153-801 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Park, Jaehan c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu 153-801 Seoul / KR | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/10] |
Former [2013/32] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000469.0 | 31.01.2013 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | KR20120010155 | 01.02.2012 Original published format: KR 20120010155 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624119 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2624119 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0482 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (KR);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
G06F3/04842 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2013/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2013/32] | English: | Electronic device and method of controlling the same | [2013/32] | French: | Dispositif électronique et son procédé de commande | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 17.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2013 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.01.2013 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IS | 07.07.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IS | 07.07.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2351639 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 13 * * page 15, line 27 - line 35; figure 12 *; | [Y]WO2011055587 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2498172 (NEC CORP [JP]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0069]; figure 7A *; | [A]JP2005269243 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | US2011169749 | WO2011135944 | EP2565764 |