EP2647896 - Connection assembly for a conical flange connection and conical flange connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORMA Germany GmbH Edisonstrasse 4 63477 Maintal / DE | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henrich, Detlef Hanauer Str. 24 63694 Limeshain / DE | 02 /
Krauss, Mathias Lehnhof 15 61130 Nidderau / DE | 03 /
Legel, Thomas Ober-Rodener Str. 122 63110 Rodgau / DE | 04 /
Mann, Stephan Im Streitfeld 5 63599 Bieber / DE | 05 /
Krüger, Manfred Finkenweg 6 63654 Büdingen / DE | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000621.6 | 07.02.2013 | [2013/41] | Priority number, date | DE20121006756 | 03.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012006756 | [2013/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2647896 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2647896 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/08 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
F16L23/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16L23/04 (US);
F16B2/08 (KR);
F16L23/032 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsanordnung für eine Kegelflanschverbindung und Kegelflanschverbindung | [2013/41] | English: | Connection assembly for a conical flange connection and conical flange connection | [2013/41] | French: | Agencement de connexion pour une liaison à brides conique et liaison à brides conique | [2013/41] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2548216 (HOUGHTON HOWARD D, et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,10,11,13 * figures 1-4,5,14 * * column 1, line 27 - line 44 * * column 2, line 32 - column 6, line 15 * [I] 12; | [XI]US3822075 (DUNCAN J) [X] 1-3,5-13 * figures 2,3,5,6,13,15,16 * * column 5, line 3 - column 7, line 16 * [I] 4,14; | [XI]DE102004050300 (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * figures 1-3 *[I] 12; | [X]US2007126234 (WIRTH GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] *; | [XI]WO2011012191 (HYDAC ACCESSORIES GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13,14 * page 8, line 25 - page 13, line 15 * * figures 1-3,7-14 * [I] 4,12 | by applicant | DE19818562 |