|
27.07.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2023 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.06.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
03.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2022 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.03.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.03.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2022 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
18.08.2021 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
07.06.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
39 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
29 |
|
02.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
134 |
|
11.01.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
32 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
27.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
28 |
|
05.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
34 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
30 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
09.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |