|
15.09.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2022 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2022 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2022 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.06.2022 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.08.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.08.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.08.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.03.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.03.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.08.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
06.06.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |