|
02.12.2022 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.12.2022 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2022 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.11.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.03.2021 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.03.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.12.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2020 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Letter relating to refund instructions (deposit account) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |