EP2886612 - Method for coating the surface of inorganic particles, in particular titanium dioxide particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, Inc. Peschstrasse 5 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Peschstrasse 5 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Jörg Unterbüscherhof 66 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Corinna Neusser Strasse 30-32 50670 Köln / DE | 03 /
Frahm, Heiko Morsbroicher Strasse 48a 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Wilkenhöner, Uwe Paradestrasse 55a 42107 Wuppertal / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 13005849.8 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886612 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/36, C09C3/06, C09C3/04 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
C09C1/3661 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09C1/3615 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09C3/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Oberflächenbeschichtung von anorganischen Partikeln, insbesondere Titandioxid-Partikeln | [2015/26] | English: | Method for coating the surface of inorganic particles, in particular titanium dioxide particles | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé de revêtement de surface de particules anorganiques, notamment de particules d'oxyde de titane | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 01.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/47] | 02.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009146834 (KRONOS INT INC [DE]) [I] 1-10 * claims 1-15 *; | [ID]US5993533 (DIEBOLD MICHAEL P [US], et al) [ID] 1-10 * example 1; claims 1-13 *; | [A]DE102006059849 (KRONOS INT INC [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | US2886366 | EP0130272 | USRE27818E | GB1340045 | US6695906 | US5993533 | US2009297852 |