EP2587605 - Active current surge limiters with voltage detector and relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia Tech Research Corporation 505 10th Street NW Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deepak, Divan 1398 Hillcrest Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
Deepak, Divan 2371 Monte Villa Courts Marietta, GA 30062 / US | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13150511.7 | 24.10.2005 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US20050648466P | 31.01.2005 Original published format: US 648466 P | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2587605 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/00, H02H9/02 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
H02J3/1807 (EP,US);
H02H9/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E40/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | Aktive Stromüberspannungsbegrenzer mit Spannungsdetektor und -relais | [2013/18] | English: | Active current surge limiters with voltage detector and relay | [2013/18] | French: | Limiteurs de surtension de courant actif avec détecteur de tension et relais | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05815446.9 / EP1847001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4924342 | US5689395 |