EP2645453 - Rechargeable battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-577 / KR | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-577 / KR | ||
For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Duk-Jung Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu, Gyeonggi-do Yongin-si / KR | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/40] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13152614.7 | 25.01.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | US201261616644P | 28.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261616644 P | US201313739743 | 11.01.2013 Original published format: US201313739743 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645453 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2645453 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/18, H01M2/26, H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M2/10, H01M2/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
H01M10/0431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/54 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (KR);
H01M50/533 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/538 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2013/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wiederaufladbare Batterie | [2013/40] | English: | Rechargeable battery | [2013/40] | French: | Batterie rechargeable | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2013 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.01.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2006051664 (TASAI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8-10,12 * figures 1,4-8 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0060] * [A] 4,6,7,11,13-15 [I] 2; | [XA]US2006115722 (KIM HYUN-SEOK [KR]) [X] 1,2,8 * claims 1-26 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,5 * [A] 3-7,9-15; | [A]EP2346110 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] ** claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2011183165 (BYUN SANGWON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * | Examination | EP2458659 |