EP2775231 - Mounting bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federnfabrik Schmid AG Bergstraße 12 8618 Oetwil Am See / CH | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüegg, Fritz Steinrieselstr. 18 9100 Herisau / CH | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Alber, Norbert Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Roßhaupter-Straße 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158151.4 | 07.03.2013 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2775231 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2775231 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
F24S25/613 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | Montagebügel | [2014/37] | English: | Mounting bracket | [2014/37] | French: | Etrier de montage | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2013 | AL | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | NO | 15.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | IE | 07.03.2015 | LU | 07.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 15.10.2014 | |
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 15.10.2014 | |
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9310063U (GENSCHOREK GIDO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 4 *; | [I]AT381342B (DACHAN ANSTALT [LI]) [I] 12-18 * figure 30 *; | [A]DE202009013596U (ETERNIT AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * figures 3-4 * |